Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gaspar, Myrna, Gaspar, John, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Brett Adams And All Occupants, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stoner, Janice K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: Abstract of Judgment Paid by: Gaspar, John (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0010993 Dated: 2/27/2008 Amount: $5.00 (Cash) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-27 15:01:19.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VW82092 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-27 15:01:19.0000000 LAST_USER: VW82092 |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Hearing result for Eviction Hearing held on 01/11/2008 09:00 AM: Default Judgment ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-11 11:27:39.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-11 11:27:39.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing | |
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment mailed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-11 11:28:15.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-11 11:28:15.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 | |
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 1/11/2008 Judgment type: Default Judgment Disposition type: Default Judgment Parties on judgment: Brett Adams and All Occupants, Defendant; Gaspar, John, Plaintiff(in favor); Gaspar, Myrna, Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-11 11:28:06.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-11 11:28:06.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 | |
January 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation returned ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-04 10:49:12.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-04 10:49:12.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
January 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Brett Adams and All Occupants Assigned to Constable Service fee $65.00 Served 1/2/2008 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-04 10:49:06.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-04 10:49:06.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-28 15:58:28.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VW82092 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-04 10:49:05.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Brett Adams Assigned to Constable Service fee of $65.00 on 12/28/2007 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-28 15:58:29.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VW82092 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-28 15:58:29.0000000 LAST_USER: VW82092 |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA OPEN) Case filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-28 15:55:33.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VW82092 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-28 15:55:33.0000000 LAST_USER: VW82092 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.