Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Value Bank Texas, filed a(n) Other Civil Suits case against Paraskevas, John George, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stoner, Janice K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2007 |
CategoryOther Civil Suits |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: Abstract of Judgment Paid by: Value Bank Texas, (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0014729 Dated: 3/9/2009 Amount: $5.00 (Cash) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-03-09 13:22:51.0000000 ENTRY_USER: PC2624 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-03-09 13:22:51.0000000 LAST_USER: PC2624 |
|
February 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment issued ENTRY_DATETIME: 2009-02-24 14:29:28.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2009-02-24 14:29:28.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 | |
December 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment mailed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-12-01 16:25:06.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-12-01 16:25:06.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 | |
December 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 12/1/2008 Judgment type: Judgment for Plaintiff Disposition type: Judgment for Plaintiff Parties on judgment: Paraskevas, John George, Defendant; Value Bank Texas,, Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-12-01 16:24:52.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-12-01 16:24:52.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 | |
December 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Justice Civil Hearing | |
December 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment for the Plaintiff Hearing result for Justice Civil Hearing held on 12/01/2008 01:15 PM: Judgment for the Plaintiff ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-12-01 16:24:25.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-12-01 16:24:25.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 |
|
October 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Justice Civil Hearing 12/01/2008 01:15 PM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-10-13 16:29:42.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-10-13 16:29:42.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 | |
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Answer - Original Answer filed Defendant's Original Answer filed....General Denial ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-11 11:41:33.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-11 11:41:33.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
January 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation returned ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-07 13:43:42.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-07 13:43:42.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served John George Paraskevas Assigned to Constable Service fee $60.00 Served 12/28/2007 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-07 13:43:30.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-07 13:43:30.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.