Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Schwartz, Ben Ryan, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Nayar Hussain And All Occupants, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stoner, Janice K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStoner, Janice K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2007 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Comment Hearing result for Eviction Hearing held on 12/13/2007 09:00 AM: Plaintiff, no show.... DISMISSED by Judge ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-13 14:30:40.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-13 14:30:40.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing | |
December 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Dismissed Per Judge ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-13 14:31:06.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-13 14:31:06.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 | |
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation returned ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 15:55:38.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 15:55:38.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: Eviction Filing Fee and Service Fee Constable 2 Paid by: Schwartz, Ben Ryan (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0009965 Dated: 12/3/2007 Amount: $82.00 (Check) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-03 11:01:17.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VW82092 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-03 11:01:17.0000000 LAST_USER: VW82092 |
|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Eviction Hearing 12/13/2007 09:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-03 11:00:05.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VW82092 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-03 11:00:05.0000000 LAST_USER: VW82092 | |
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA OPEN) Case filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-03 10:57:47.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VW82092 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-03 10:57:47.0000000 LAST_USER: VW82092 |
|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-03 10:59:23.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VW82092 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 15:55:26.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Nayar Hussain Assigned to Constable Service fee of $65.00 on 12/3/2007 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-03 10:59:26.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VW82092 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-03 10:59:26.0000000 LAST_USER: VW82092 |
|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Nayar Hussain and All Occupants Assigned to Constable Service fee $65.00 Served 12/3/2007 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 15:55:28.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 15:55:28.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.