Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Christiwood Apartments, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Garza, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Cox, Larry G. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing | |
January 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 1/4/2008 Judgment type: Judgment for Plaintiff Disposition type: Judgment for Plaintiff Parties on judgment: Garza, Christopher, Defendant; Christiwood Apartments, Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-04 11:13:34.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-04 11:13:34.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 | |
January 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment for the Plaintiff Hearing result for Eviction Hearing held on 01/04/2008 09:00 AM: Judgment for the Plaintiff for $646.33 plus court costs, interest at 8.25% per annum, and possession. ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-04 11:12:53.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-04 11:12:53.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Eviction Citation Issued ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-28 13:25:00.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JJ68434 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-28 13:25:00.0000000 LAST_USER: JJ68434 |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: JP Filing Eviction Paid by: Christiwood Apartments (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0005717 Dated: 12/28/2007 Amount: $17.00 (Cash) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-28 13:51:40.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JJ68434 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-28 13:51:40.0000000 LAST_USER: JJ68434 |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: Eviction Service Fee - Constable 2 Paid by: Christiwood Apartments (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0005717 Dated: 12/28/2007 Amount: $65.00 (Cash) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-28 13:51:38.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JJ68434 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-28 13:51:38.0000000 LAST_USER: JJ68434 |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA OPEN) Case filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-28 13:22:44.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JJ68434 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-28 13:22:44.0000000 LAST_USER: JJ68434 |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Eviction Hearing 01/04/2008 09:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-28 13:24:43.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JJ68434 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-28 13:24:43.0000000 LAST_USER: JJ68434 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.