Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Contreras, Pearl, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Monzano, Jerri, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Cox, Larry G. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal by Plaintiff/Nonsuit/Non-Final Dismissed by Plaintiff ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-04 09:44:22.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-04 09:44:22.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
January 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment Hearing result for Eviction Hearing held on 01/04/2008 09:00 AM: Judgment entered, dismissed on plaintiff's motion. ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-04 09:44:08.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-04 09:44:08.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
January 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing | |
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: Eviction Service Fee - Constable 2 Paid by: Contreras, Pearl (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0005705 Dated: 12/27/2007 Amount: $65.00 (Cash) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-27 14:22:07.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JJ68434 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-27 14:22:07.0000000 LAST_USER: JJ68434 |
|
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Eviction Citation Issued ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-27 14:07:49.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JJ68434 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-27 14:07:49.0000000 LAST_USER: JJ68434 |
|
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: JP Filing Eviction Paid by: Contreras, Pearl (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0005705 Dated: 12/27/2007 Amount: $17.00 (Cash) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-27 14:22:08.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JJ68434 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-27 14:22:08.0000000 LAST_USER: JJ68434 |
|
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA OPEN) Case filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-27 14:06:26.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JJ68434 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-27 14:06:26.0000000 LAST_USER: JJ68434 |
|
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Eviction Hearing 01/04/2008 09:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-27 14:07:30.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JJ68434 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-27 14:07:30.0000000 LAST_USER: JJ68434 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.