Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garza, Dora, Grande, Ben, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Gonzales, Marina Krystal, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzalez, Joe A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Comment Hearing result for Eviction Hearing held on 01/09/2008 09:00 AM: Trial By Judge ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-10 11:03:41.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-10 11:03:41.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 |
|
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 1/9/2008 Judgment type: Judgment for Plaintiff Disposition type: Judgment for Plaintiff Parties on judgment: Gonzales, Marina Krystal, Defendant; Garza, Dora, Plaintiff(in favor); Grande, Ben, Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-10 11:04:20.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-10 11:04:20.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 | |
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing | |
January 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Answer - Original Answer filed Defendant's Original Answer filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-03 16:36:44.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-03 16:36:44.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 |
|
January 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Marina Krystal Gonzales Assigned to Constable Service fee $0.00 Served 1/3/2008 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-10 11:03:28.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-10 11:03:28.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-10 11:03:17.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-10 11:03:27.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA OPEN) Case filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-28 12:50:46.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-28 12:50:46.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: Eviction Filing Fee and Service Fee Constable 1 Paid by: Grande, Ben (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0014106 Dated: 12/28/2007 Amount: $82.00 (Check) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-28 13:05:15.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-28 13:05:15.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Marina Krystal Gonzales Assigned to Constable Service fee of $0.00 on 12/28/2007 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-10 11:03:18.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-10 11:03:18.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Eviction Hearing 01/09/2008 09:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-28 13:03:27.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DR9360 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-28 13:03:27.0000000 LAST_USER: DR9360 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.