Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Conn Appliance Inc, filed a(n) Other Civil Suits case represented by Williams, Pamela D., against Pena, Michelle G, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Cox, Larry G. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Larry G. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2007 |
CategoryOther Civil Suits |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment Hearing result for Default Hearing held on 02/08/2008 10:00 AM: Judgment entered order to dismiss cause w/o prejudice ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-03-11 10:05:49.0000000 ENTRY_USER: VG68121 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-03-11 10:05:49.0000000 LAST_USER: VG68121 |
|
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing (OCA) | |
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Default Hearing 02/08/2008 10:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-23 09:20:02.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-23 09:20:02.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 | |
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation returned ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-10 07:37:33.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-10 07:37:33.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
January 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Michelle G Pena Assigned to Service fee $0.00 Served 1/3/2008 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-10 07:37:23.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-10 07:37:23.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service To PCP-Clint Lovejoy for service. ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-18 17:17:48.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-10 07:37:23.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Michelle G Pena Assigned to Service fee of $0.00 on 12/18/2007 To PCP-Clint Lovejoy for service. ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-18 17:17:49.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-18 17:17:49.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA OPEN) Case filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 10:36:42.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 10:36:42.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: JP Filing Civil Suit Paid by: Conn Appliances, Inc D/B/A Conn's (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0005531 Dated: 12/4/2007 Amount: $17.00 (Check) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 10:38:28.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 10:38:28.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
December 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Letter of representation from attorney Plaintiff: Conn Appliances, Inc D/B/A Conn's Letter of representation from attorney Pamela D Williams ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 10:37:31.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-04 10:37:31.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.