Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fraser, Stephen W, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Fries, Angie, Fries, Troy, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzalez, Joe A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment Hearing result for Non jury Trial held on 02/27/2008 10:00 AM: Judgment entered 02/28/2008 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION..SIGNED BY JUDGE ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-03-05 15:24:54.0000000 ENTRY_USER: RS68141 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-03-05 15:24:54.0000000 LAST_USER: RS68141 |
|
February 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 2/28/2008 Judgment type: Dismissed Disposition type: Dismissed Parties on judgment: Fries, Angie, Defendant; Fries, Troy, Defendant; None,, Other Party(in favor); Fraser, Stephen W, Plaintiff ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-04-10 16:08:30.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-04-10 16:08:30.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 | |
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial TYPE_COMMENT: 02/28/2008 ORDER FOR DISMISSAL FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION..SIGNED BY JUDGE |
|
February 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Non jury Trial 02/27/2008 10:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-13 15:34:09.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-13 15:34:09.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 | |
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Answer - Original Answer filed Defendant's Original Answer filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-07 14:37:38.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-07 14:37:38.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Angie Fries Assigned to Constable Service fee $0.00 Served 1/11/2008 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-18 16:31:30.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-18 16:31:30.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 |
|
January 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Troy Fries Assigned to Constable Service fee $0.00 Served 1/11/2008 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-18 16:33:05.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-18 16:33:05.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 |
|
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Troy Fries Assigned to Constable Service fee of $0.00 on 1/9/2008 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-09 16:19:19.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-09 16:19:19.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 |
|
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-09 16:19:18.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-18 16:33:04.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 |
|
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Angie Fries Assigned to Constable Service fee of $0.00 on 1/9/2008 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-09 16:19:31.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-09 16:19:31.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.