Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Corpus Christi Institute Of Pain Management, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Garcia, Jimmy, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzalez, Joe A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Comment Hearing result for Small Claim Hearing held on 03/06/2008 08:00 AM: Trial By Judge ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-05-21 16:54:38.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-05-21 16:54:38.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 |
|
April 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 4/21/2008 Judgment type: Dismissed Disposition type: Dismissed Parties on judgment: Garcia, Jimmy, Defendant; None,, Other Party(in favor); Corpus Christi Institute Of Pain Management, Plaintiff ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-05-21 16:54:14.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-05-21 16:54:14.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 | |
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
February 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Hearing result for Hearing held on 02/25/2008 09:00 AM: Notice of Reset ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-25 11:08:21.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-25 11:08:21.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 |
|
February 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Small Claim Hearing 03/06/2008 08:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-25 11:08:43.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-25 11:08:43.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 | |
February 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing (OCA) | |
February 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Hearing 02/25/2008 09:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-13 14:39:33.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-13 14:39:33.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 | |
November 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Returned No Service Citation: Returned No Service Jimmy Garcia Assigned to Constable ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-11-09 11:43:41.0000000 ENTRY_USER: MS9710 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-11-09 11:43:41.0000000 LAST_USER: MS9710 |
|
November 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Jimmy Garcia Assigned to Constable Service fee $70.00 Served 11/7/2007 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-05-21 16:53:08.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-05-21 16:53:08.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 |
|
November 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-11-01 16:00:43.0000000 ENTRY_USER: DA6341 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-05-21 16:53:07.0000000 LAST_USER: DA6341 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.