Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bush, Debbie, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Kline, Shawyn, Kline, Betty, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Cox, Larry G. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 29, 2007 |
CategoryEviction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2007 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing | |
June 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Hearing result for Eviction Hearing held on 06/08/2007 09:00 AM: Default Judgment for $1,234.00 plus court costs and interest at 8.25% per annum. ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-06-08 10:47:51.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-06-08 10:47:51.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
June 08, 2007 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 6/8/2007 Judgment type: Default Judgment Disposition type: Default Judgment Parties on judgment: Kline, Betty, Defendant; Kline, Shawyn, Defendant; Bush, Debbie, Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-06-08 10:48:24.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-06-08 10:48:24.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 | |
May 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-05-29 11:06:09.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-06-08 10:47:15.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
May 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Betty Kline Assigned to Service fee $0.00 Served 5/29/2007 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-06-08 10:47:00.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-06-08 10:47:00.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
May 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-05-29 11:01:33.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-06-08 10:47:00.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
May 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Betty Kline Assigned to Service fee of $0.00 on 5/29/2007 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-05-29 11:01:34.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-05-29 11:01:34.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
May 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Shawyn Kline Assigned to Service fee of $0.00 on 5/29/2007 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-05-29 11:06:10.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-05-29 11:06:10.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
May 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Shawyn Kline Assigned to Service fee $0.00 Served 5/29/2007 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-06-08 10:47:15.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-06-08 10:47:15.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
May 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: Eviction Service Fee - Constable 2 Paid by: Bush, Debbie (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0004003 Dated: 5/29/2007 Amount: $130.00 (Check) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-05-29 10:48:37.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-05-29 10:48:37.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.