Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cumpian, Marian, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Garza, Candelario, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stoner, Janice K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStoner, Janice K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment for the Plaintiff Hearing result for Small Claim Hearing held on 02/19/2008 09:30 AM: Judgment for the Plaintiff ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-19 10:45:34.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-19 10:45:34.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 |
|
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 2/19/2008 Judgment type: Judgment for Plaintiff Disposition type: Judgment for Plaintiff Parties on judgment: Garza, Candelario, Defendant; Cumpian, Marian, Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-19 10:46:06.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-19 10:46:06.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 | |
February 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Small Claim Hearing 02/19/2008 09:30 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-28 16:53:31.0000000 ENTRY_USER: EH3966 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-28 16:53:31.0000000 LAST_USER: EH3966 | |
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Answer - Original Answer filed Defendant's Original Answer filed......General Denial ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-14 11:00:46.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-14 11:00:46.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
January 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation returned ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-07 12:55:15.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-07 12:55:15.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
January 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served Candelario Garza Assigned to Constable Service fee $45.00 Served 1/2/2008 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-07 12:54:59.0000000 ENTRY_USER: LD6788521 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-07 12:54:59.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-06 13:25:18.0000000 ENTRY_USER: PC2624 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-07 12:54:58.0000000 LAST_USER: LD6788521 |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Candelario Garza Assigned to Constable Service fee of $45.00 on 12/28/2007 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-06 13:25:18.0000000 ENTRY_USER: PC2624 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-06 13:25:18.0000000 LAST_USER: PC2624 |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: Small Claims Filing Fee and Service Fee Constable 2 Paid by: Cumpian, Marian (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0010275 Dated: 12/28/2007 Amount: $57.00 (Check) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-28 13:42:36.0000000 ENTRY_USER: PC2624 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-28 13:42:36.0000000 LAST_USER: PC2624 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.