Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Johnson, D.L., filed a(n) Other Civil Suits case against Cantu, David, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Balderas, Robert ' Bobby ' presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBalderas, Robert ' Bobby ' Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2007 |
CategoryOther Civil Suits |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service Writ: Served David Cantu Assigned to Officer Service fee $0.00 Served 4/4/2008 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-04-19 09:23:52.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JS5316 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-04-19 09:23:52.0000000 LAST_USER: JS5316 |
|
March 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Service ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-03-24 08:27:00.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JS5316 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-04-19 09:23:50.0000000 LAST_USER: JS5316 |
|
March 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Issued Writ: Issued David Cantu Assigned to Officer Service fee of $0.00 on 3/24/2008 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-03-24 08:27:01.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JS5316 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-03-24 08:27:01.0000000 LAST_USER: JS5316 |
|
March 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Filing: Writ Filing Fee and Service Fee NCSO Paid by: Johnson, D.L. (plaintiff) Receipt number: 0008269 Dated: 3/18/2008 Amount: $155.00 (Cash) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-03-18 15:14:41.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JS5316 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-03-18 15:14:41.0000000 LAST_USER: JS5316 |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 2/5/2008 Judgment type: Judgment for Plaintiff Disposition type: Judgment for Plaintiff Parties on judgment: Cantu, David, Defendant; Johnson, D.L., Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-05 14:12:34.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JS5316 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-05 14:12:34.0000000 LAST_USER: JS5316 | |
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment for the Plaintiff Hearing result for Justice Civil Hearing held on 02/05/2008 02:00 PM: Judgment for the Plaintiff ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-05 14:10:04.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JS5316 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-05 14:10:04.0000000 LAST_USER: JS5316 |
|
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Justice Civil Hearing | |
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Justice Civil Hearing 02/05/2008 09:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-18 10:26:22.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JS5316 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-18 10:26:22.0000000 LAST_USER: JS5316 | |
December 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service Citation: Served David Cantu Assigned to Constable Service fee $65.00 Served 12/7/2007 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-05 14:09:48.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JS5316 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-05 14:09:48.0000000 LAST_USER: JS5316 |
|
December 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Filed (OCA OPEN) Case filed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2007-12-06 09:27:55.0000000 ENTRY_USER: BG8695 LAST_DATETIME: 2007-12-06 09:27:55.0000000 LAST_USER: BG8695 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.