Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Davis, Kristin, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Stanford, Adam, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stoner, Janice K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStoner, Janice K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
February 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Hearing result for Small Claim Hearing held on 02/25/2008 01:30 PM: Notice of Reset ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-13 16:00:22.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JLS8134 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-13 16:00:22.0000000 LAST_USER: JLS8134 |
|
February 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Small Claim Hearing 03/11/2008 02:00 PM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-13 16:01:01.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JLS8134 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-13 16:01:01.0000000 LAST_USER: JLS8134 | |
February 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Hearing result for Small Claim Hearing held on 03/24/2008 10:00 AM: Notice of Reset ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-12 10:24:52.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JLS8134 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-12 10:24:52.0000000 LAST_USER: JLS8134 |
|
February 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Small Claim Hearing 02/25/2008 01:30 PM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-12 10:25:12.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JLS8134 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-12 10:25:12.0000000 LAST_USER: JLS8134 | |
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Small Claim Hearing 03/24/2008 10:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-08 11:56:02.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JLS8134 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-08 11:56:02.0000000 LAST_USER: JLS8134 | |
February 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Hearing result for Small Claim Hearing held on 02/05/2008 01:30 PM: Notice of Reset ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-02-05 11:39:56.0000000 ENTRY_USER: ST8666 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-02-05 11:39:56.0000000 LAST_USER: ST8666 |
|
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice Hearing result for Small Claim Hearing held on 01/23/2008 08:00 AM: Notice of Reset ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-23 08:23:11.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JLS8134 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-23 08:23:11.0000000 LAST_USER: JLS8134 |
|
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Small Claim Hearing 02/05/2008 01:30 PM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-23 08:24:24.0000000 ENTRY_USER: JLS8134 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-23 08:24:24.0000000 LAST_USER: JLS8134 | |
January 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Small Claim Hearing 01/23/2008 08:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2008-01-14 16:43:50.0000000 ENTRY_USER: ST8666 LAST_DATETIME: 2008-01-14 16:43:50.0000000 LAST_USER: ST8666 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.