Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Caudle, Kenneth, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Cararra Marble, Llc, represented by Dodson, Paul, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Santana, Henry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2004 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2005 | Docket Event | Judgment for the Plaintiff - $1505 plus court costs ENTRY_DATETIME: 2005-08-25 14:40:51.0000000 ENTRY_USER: BS6685 LAST_DATETIME: 2005-08-25 14:40:51.0000000 LAST_USER: BS6685 | |
August 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Correspondence mailed copy of judgment to plt & def's atty ENTRY_DATETIME: 2005-08-25 14:40:51.0000000 ENTRY_USER: BS6685 LAST_DATETIME: 2005-08-25 14:40:51.0000000 LAST_USER: BS6685 |
|
August 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Judgment Hearing result for Small Claim Hearing held on 08/02/2005 09:00 AM: Judgment entered ENTRY_DATETIME: 2005-08-25 14:40:15.0000000 ENTRY_USER: BS6685 LAST_DATETIME: 2005-08-25 14:40:15.0000000 LAST_USER: BS6685 |
|
August 23, 2005 | Docket Event |
Telephone Call left message on Paul Dodson's answering machine @ 8:25 a.m. to call me ASAP about judgment he was supposed to be preparing for the Judge's signature - told him if he didn't return call the Judge would prepare his own judgment ENTRY_DATETIME: 2005-08-25 14:43:50.0000000 ENTRY_USER: BS6685 LAST_DATETIME: 2005-08-25 14:43:50.0000000 LAST_USER: BS6685 |
|
July 01, 2005 | Docket Event | Amended Petition ENTRY_DATETIME: 2005-07-05 08:18:45.0000000 ENTRY_USER: BS6685 LAST_DATETIME: 2005-07-05 08:18:45.0000000 LAST_USER: BS6685 | |
July 01, 2005 | Docket Event | Request for disclosure filed per plt ENTRY_DATETIME: 2005-07-05 08:18:45.0000000 ENTRY_USER: BS6685 LAST_DATETIME: 2005-07-05 08:18:45.0000000 LAST_USER: BS6685 | |
June 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notification Notified attorney ENTRY_DATETIME: 2005-06-14 14:09:21.0000000 ENTRY_USER: BS6685 LAST_DATETIME: 2005-06-14 14:09:21.0000000 LAST_USER: BS6685 |
|
June 14, 2005 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Small Claim Hearing 08/02/2005 09:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2005-06-14 14:09:08.0000000 ENTRY_USER: BS6685 LAST_DATETIME: 2005-06-14 14:09:08.0000000 LAST_USER: BS6685 | |
June 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notification Notified plaintiff ENTRY_DATETIME: 2005-06-14 14:09:21.0000000 ENTRY_USER: BS6685 LAST_DATETIME: 2005-06-14 14:09:21.0000000 LAST_USER: BS6685 |
|
June 13, 2005 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance filed and granted for Plt ENTRY_DATETIME: 2005-06-13 10:15:09.0000000 ENTRY_USER: BS6685 LAST_DATETIME: 2005-06-13 10:15:09.0000000 LAST_USER: BS6685 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.