Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Stowers, Alan & Sandra, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Scooter Mart Inc., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Cox, Larry G. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCox, Larry G. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2004 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2005 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
July 21, 2005 | Docket Event | Judgment entered order date: 7/21/2005 Judgment type: Judgment for Plaintiff Disposition type: Judgment for Plaintiff Parties on judgment: Scooter Mart Inc.,, Defendant; Stowers, Alan & Sandra, Plaintiff(in favor) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2005-07-21 10:54:58.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2005-07-21 10:54:58.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 | |
July 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Judgment Hearing result for Small Claim Hearing held on 07/21/2005 10:00 AM: Judgment entered for the Plaintiff $270.00 + Court Cost ENTRY_DATETIME: 2005-07-21 10:54:24.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2005-07-21 10:54:24.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
June 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv Trial Notice Sent ENTRY_DATETIME: 2005-06-30 15:22:54.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TW7409 LAST_DATETIME: 2005-06-30 15:22:54.0000000 LAST_USER: TW7409 |
|
June 30, 2005 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled (Small Claim Hearing 07/21/2005 10:00 AM) ENTRY_DATETIME: 2005-06-30 15:22:33.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TW7409 LAST_DATETIME: 2005-06-30 15:22:33.0000000 LAST_USER: TW7409 | |
March 30, 2005 | Docket Event |
Reminders answer due REMINDER_FOR: TW7409 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2005-03-30 08:33:59.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TW7409 LAST_DATETIME: 2005-03-30 08:33:59.0000000 LAST_USER: TW7409 |
|
March 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation returned ENTRY_DATETIME: 2005-03-30 08:33:34.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TW7409 LAST_DATETIME: 2005-03-30 08:33:34.0000000 LAST_USER: TW7409 |
|
March 21, 2005 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued Citation executed ENTRY_DATETIME: 2005-03-30 08:33:34.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TW7409 LAST_DATETIME: 2005-03-30 08:33:34.0000000 LAST_USER: TW7409 |
|
March 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Service ENTRY_DATETIME: 2005-07-21 10:53:19.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2005-07-21 10:53:19.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
|
March 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Issued Citation: Issued Alan & Sandra Stowers Assigned to OTA, Officer Service fee of $0.00 on 3/18/2005 ENTRY_DATETIME: 2005-07-21 10:53:22.0000000 ENTRY_USER: TR5324 LAST_DATETIME: 2005-07-21 10:53:22.0000000 LAST_USER: TR5324 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.