Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Painter, Joyce Belle, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Vannoy, Warren Dale, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Saldana, Marisela presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2010 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce-granted |
|
December 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
November 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Statement | |
November 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FH |
|
September 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer |
|
August 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (CN1): WARREN DALE VANNOY SERVED: Served By: RUDY CACERES CN1 Issue Date: 08/11/2010 |
|
August 11, 2010 | Docket Event | Citation issued 8-11-2010 and walked to CN1; Returned to our office to foward to CN2. Sent out to CN2 on 8-31-2010 due to being filed placed in the returns basket by a clerk. | |
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv BVS/FORM/GN |
|
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv FAMILY LAW CASE INFO SHEET/GN |
|
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.