Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Castillo, Patricio, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bonilla, Clay, against Rickel, Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Vargas, Robert J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
October 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLFT'S MTN F DISMISSAL/CC |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SRVC SHEET REQ NO SRVC/DA |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET/DA |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CVR LTR/DA |
|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | CITATION NPDC (PU): PATRICIA RICKEL SERVED: 01/03/2009 FILED: 01/06/2009 Issue Date: 12/31/2008 File Date: 01/06/2009 Service Date: 01/03/2009 | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION NPDC (PU): PATRICIA RICKEL SERVED: 01/03/2009 FILED: 01/06/2009 Issue Date: 12/31/2008 File Date: 01/06/2009 Service Date: 01/03/2009 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.