Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tober, Frank, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ogle, Scott P., against Pardo,Jr, Angel Cruz, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Galvan, Deeanne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2008 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
January 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Of Nonsuit With Prejudice | |
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting for Dismissal |
|
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Suggestion of Death And Scire Facias | |
April 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Withdraw as Counsel Lamar G. Clemons |
|
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) Mtn w/draw |
|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.