Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Edison, Jennifer, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Devera, George, against Hicks, Eric, Veracautrin, Amber, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Comp, represented by Upton, James W, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2008 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion Joint Motion To Dismiss With Prejudice w/ Order |
|
May 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) AGRD ORDER ON CONTINUANCE/I |
|
March 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AGREED MTN FCONTINUANCE/CC |
|
March 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: PROGRESSIVE COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMP |
|
February 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLFT'S DESIGANTION O EXPERTS/CC |
|
September 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Docket Control Order | |
August 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Hearing (OCA) | |
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTIFICATION REGARDING CONSENT F MEDICAL CARE/CC |
|
July 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RULE 11 AGREEMENT/CP E-FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.