Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ware, Marc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Swacina, Paul, against Olivarez, Mario, represented by Cassidy, Les, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Vargas, Robert J. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2008 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RTN DWOP NOTC /GG |
|
May 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RTN DWOP NOTC /GG |
|
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) D.W.O.P. |
|
May 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RTN DWOP NOTC /GG |
|
April 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RTN DWOP NOTC /GG |
|
September 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN T WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL/CC |
|
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLTF'S RESPONSE TO DEFT'S REQ TO INCREASE BOND/SH |
|
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO INCREASE BOND/TG |
|
July 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) BOND HEARING |
|
July 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) INJUNCTION HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.