Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Haywood, Barbara, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Heil, Robert J., Iii, against Homecoming Financial, Na, Np Homes, Inc, represented by Brown, Bryan T, Barre, Denny, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DC (4 days) |
|
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) OTHER |
|
March 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTICE OF NON-SUIT/CC |
|
February 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DEFT N.P. HOMES' DESIGNATION O EXPERTS/CC |
|
December 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) PL MOT TO WITHDRAW / PL MOT TO RELEASE BOND |
|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN T WITHDRAW/CC |
|
December 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN T RELEASE BOND/CC |
|
September 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER DC 04/15/10 JT 04/19/10 |
|
March 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL (DENNY BARRE) |
|
March 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DEF MOT. TO WITHDRAW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.