Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
De La Garza, Ramon, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Herrman, Gregory H., against Owens, Danielle Y, represented by Leon, Roland L., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Klager, James E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 26, 2008 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Envelope Returned Undelivered Notice Of Judgment And Dismissal |
|
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Order - Agreed Order OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Agreed Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice./DB |
|
July 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter /DB |
|
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) Motion to Dismiss |
|
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss /for Want of Prosecution And Order |
|
March 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv FILING CERTIFICATE/CC |
|
February 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv FILING CERTIFICATE/CC |
|
February 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTC O INT TK DEPO B W/QUES C/R F CHIROPRACTIC PREFF ET,AL |
|
February 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NTC O INTENTION T TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRIT QUESTIONS/CC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.