Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Juarez, Lucy Hernandez, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Juarez, Andres, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Greenwell, Thomas F. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2008 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Z - Certificate of Termination of Assignment (AG) Notice of Termination of Assignment and Child Support Services |
|
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Z - Notice of Change of Payee (AG) | |
February 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce/I |
|
February 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Re-Activate Case (OCA) Court Orders Suspense Status Lifted |
|
July 31, 2010 | Docket Event | De-Activate Case (OCA) | |
April 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FRM LUCY JUAREZ RE; CHNG O ADDR |
|
February 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) F.H. (30 MIN) |
|
February 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SUGGESTION O BANKRUPTCY/CC |
|
February 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY/MM |
|
February 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER OF TRANSFER TO SUSPENSE DOCKET (SCANNED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.