Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2008 |
CategoryDivorce (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DEFENDANTS' DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES/CC |
|
November 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NTC O INTENTION T TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRIT QUESTIONS/CC |
|
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) OTHER CV 0000 P 0000- CHANGE MADE TO FINAL ORDER |
|
August 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: RAUL TIJERINA |
|
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event | CITATION (PU): RAUL TIJERINA SERVED: 07/03/2008 FILED: 07/22/2008 Issue Date: 07/01/2008 File Date: 07/22/2008 Service Date: 07/03/2008 | |
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (PU): RAUL TIJERINA SERVED: 07/03/2008 FILED: 07/22/2008 Issue Date: 07/01/2008 File Date: 07/22/2008 Service Date: 07/03/2008 |
|
June 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv FAM CASE INFO SHEET/FP |
|
June 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFDVT O INDIGENCY/FP |
|
June 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
June 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC INFO SHEET REQ SVC/FP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.