Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pate, Richard, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bonilla, Clay, against Scruggs, George Paul, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Galvan, Bobby presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2008 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) OTHER CV 0000 P 0000- CHANGE MADE TO FINAL ORDER |
|
January 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv JOINT MTN FOR NONSUIT/RM *ORG TO COURT BY LIZ* |
|
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT CERTF O WRTN DISCVY DIRECTED T PLT /GG |
|
June 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT'S PLEA T JURSIDCITION & 2ND AMD ORIGINAL ANSWER/GAG |
|
June 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT CERTF O WRTN DISCVY /GG |
|
May 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DFT CERTF O WRTN DISCVY DIRECTED T PLT /GG |
|
May 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DEFENDANT'S PLEA T THE JURSIDICTION & 1ST AMENDED ORIGINAL ANSW |
|
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: GEORGE PAUL SCRUGGS |
|
March 31, 2008 | Docket Event | CITATION NPDC (PU): GEORGE PAUL SCRUGGS SERVED: 04/12/2008 FILED: 04/16/2008 Issue Date: 03/31/2008 File Date: 04/16/2008 Service Date: 04/12/2008 | |
March 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.