Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Adkins, Allen L, against Montalvo, Beto, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC SHT REQ NO SVC/SH |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | CITATION NPDC (PU): BETO MONTALVO SERVED: 12/29/2007 FILED: 01/02/2008 Issue Date: 12/28/2007 File Date: 01/02/2008 Service Date: 12/29/2007 | |
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL CASE INFO SHT/SH |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION NPDC (PU): BETO MONTALVO SERVED: 12/29/2007 FILED: 01/02/2008 Issue Date: 12/28/2007 File Date: 01/02/2008 Service Date: 12/29/2007 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.