Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Adkins, Allen L, against Kincaid, Robert G, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Klager, James E. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT: CITIBANK (SOUTH DAKOTA) N.A. Issue Date: 05/19/2008 |
|
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv INFO SHEET REQ SVC/JM |
|
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CVR LTR REQ SVC (AJ)/JM |
|
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
March 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN FOR DEFAULT JUDGMNT /LS |
|
March 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN MAILING ADDRESS /LS |
|
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTE SERVICE/I |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN F SUBS SERVICE /FP |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL CASE INFO SHT/SH |
|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | CITATION NPDC (PU): ROBERT G KINCAID SERVED: 02/18/2008 FILED: 02/19/2008 Served By: BERTA ALLEN OTH Issue Date: 12/28/2007 File Date: 02/19/2008 Service Date: 02/18/2008 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.