Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Atlantic Credit & Finance, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Regent, Anh H, against Hinojosa, Antonio, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzales, Lisa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN F DEFAULT JGMNT/FP |
|
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event | CITATION (PU): ANTONIO HINOJOSA SERVED: 01/17/2008 FILED: 01/23/2008 Served By: PCP OTH Issue Date: 01/09/2008 File Date: 01/23/2008 Service Date: 01/17/2008 | |
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (PU): ANTONIO HINOJOSA SERVED: 01/17/2008 FILED: 01/23/2008 Served By: PCP OTH Issue Date: 01/09/2008 File Date: 01/23/2008 Service Date: 01/17/2008 |
|
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC SHT REQ SVC/SH |
|
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC INST SHT T CLK/SH |
|
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL CASE INFO SHT/SH |
|
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.