Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lvnv Funding, Llc Assignee Of Sears, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Espinosa, Claudine, against Washington Mutual Bank, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzales, Lisa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2007 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NTC O NON-SUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE/CC |
|
August 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) D.W.O.P. |
|
December 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv WRIT OF GARNSHMT AFT JGMT (R): WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK SERVED: Issue Date: 12/06/2007 |
|
December 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation WRIT OF GARNSHMT AFT JGMT (R): WASHINGTON MUTUAL BANK SERVED: Issue Date: 12/06/2007 |
|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CVR LTR W/INSTRUCTIONS/JJM |
|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CVL INFO SHEET/JJM |
|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC SHEET REQ SVC/JJM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.