Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bransford, John, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Garcia, Amador C, against Killough, Jacqueline, represented by Sullivan, Roger, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzales, Lisa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2007 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
January 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORAL DEPO OF JOHN BRANSFORD/E-FILED |
|
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLFT'S NTC O NON-SUIT WITH PREJUDICE/CC |
|
November 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv REPORTER'S CERTF DEPOSITION O JACOQUELINE KILLOUH 10/10/2008/CC |
|
November 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NTC O DELIVERY/CC |
|
October 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FROM AMADOR C GARCIA TO PAMELA/GAG |
|
October 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE I |
|
October 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DC (2-3 days) |
|
October 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv JOINT MTN F CONTINUANCE/FP WALKED UP BY ATTY |
|
October 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NTC O INTENTION T TAKE DEPOSITION BY WRIT QUESTIONS/CC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.