Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Regent, Anh H, against Gower, Ralph A, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2007 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit & Dismissal And Order |
|
August 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) D.W.O.P. |
|
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN F DEFAULT JGMNT/FP E-FILED |
|
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFDVT I/S O ATTY FEES/FP E-FILED |
|
August 21, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFDVT O NON-MILITARY SVC/FP E-FILED - . |
|
April 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv REQ F ADMISSIONS/FP |
|
February 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DECLARATION OF NOT FOUND/SH |
|
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (PU): RALPH A. GOWER SERVED: 03/28/2008 FILED: 04/01/2008 Served By: GARY S MCCLUSKEY OTH Issue Date: 11/27/2007 File Date: 04/01/2008 Service Date: 03/28/2008 |
|
November 27, 2007 | Docket Event | CITATION (PU): RALPH A. GOWER SERVED: 03/28/2008 FILED: 04/01/2008 Served By: GARY S MCCLUSKEY OTH Issue Date: 11/27/2007 File Date: 04/01/2008 Service Date: 03/28/2008 | |
November 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC INFO SHEET REQ SVC/FP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.