Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Adkins, Allen L, against Wilson, Sharon N, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 29, 2007 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
January 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN F DEFAULT JGMT /GG |
|
November 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE I . |
|
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFFIDAVIT FOR SUBS SVC/CP |
|
November 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE/CP |
|
October 30, 2007 | Docket Event | CITATION NPDC (PU): SHARON N. WILSON SERVED: 11/30/2007 FILED: 12/03/2007 Issue Date: 10/30/2007 File Date: 12/03/2007 Service Date: 11/30/2007 | |
October 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION NPDC (PU): SHARON N. WILSON SERVED: 11/30/2007 FILED: 12/03/2007 Issue Date: 10/30/2007 File Date: 12/03/2007 Service Date: 11/30/2007 |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC SHT REQ NO SVC/SH |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.