Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hudson & Keyse, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Miller, Robert T, Jr., against Wooten, Irene G, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Vargas, Robert J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVargas, Robert J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2007 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT NON MILITARY AFDVIT /GG |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CERTF O LAST KNOWN ADDR/GG |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT 1ST AMD MTN F DEFAULT JGMT /GG |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFDVIT I SPT O ATTY FEES /GG |
|
June 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CERTF O LAST KNOWN ADDR /GG |
|
June 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT NON MILITARY AFDVIT /GG |
|
June 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT MTN F DEFAULT JGMT /GG |
|
June 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFDVIT I SPT O ATTY FEES /GG |
|
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (R): IRENE G. WOOTEN SERVED: 05/01/2007 FILED: 05/02/2007 Issue Date: 04/02/2007 File Date: 05/02/2007 Service Date: 05/01/2007 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.