Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Turman, Greg, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Waterhouse, Rick, against Gallio, Cynthia White, Gallio, John C, Gallio, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStith, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2007 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RTN NOTC O JGMT /GAG |
|
April 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RTND NTCOF JUDGMNT &/OR DISMISSAL LETTER /LS |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) TRANSFERRED - CHANGE OF VENUE |
|
April 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLTF'S NON-SUIT AGAINST ALL DFTS/FP WALKED UP BY ATTY |
|
March 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (PU): CHRISTOPHER GALLIO SERVED: Issue Date: 03/30/2007 |
|
March 30, 2007 | Docket Event | CITATION (PU): CHRISTOPHER GALLIO SERVED: Issue Date: 03/30/2007 | |
March 30, 2007 | Docket Event | CITATION (PU): JOHN C. GALLIO SERVED: Issue Date: 03/30/2007 | |
March 30, 2007 | Docket Event | CITATION (PU): CYNTHIA WHITE GALLIO SERVED: Issue Date: 03/30/2007 | |
March 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (PU): CYNTHIA WHITE GALLIO SERVED: Issue Date: 03/30/2007 |
|
March 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (PU): JOHN C. GALLIO SERVED: Issue Date: 03/30/2007 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.