Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Texas, State Of, Mendota Insurance Co, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Attorney General, Gauntt, J. Chad, against Garza, Aaron, Garza, Santos, represented by Klein, David J., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Galvan, Bobby presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
February 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT'S MTN F NONSUIT DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE/CP E-FILE |
|
January 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: SANTOS GARZA |
|
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event | CITATION (CN2): SANTOS GARZA SERVED: 01/11/2008 FILED: 01/14/2008 Served By: JERRY C. BOUCHER CN2 Issue Date: 01/09/2008 File Date: 01/14/2008 Service Date: 01/11/2008 | |
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event | CITATION (CN2): AARON GARZA SERVED: 01/11/2008 FILED: 01/14/2008 Served By: JERRY C. BOUCHER CN2 Issue Date: 01/09/2008 File Date: 01/14/2008 Service Date: 01/11/2008 | |
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (CN2): SANTOS GARZA SERVED: 01/11/2008 FILED: 01/14/2008 Served By: JERRY C. BOUCHER CN2 Issue Date: 01/09/2008 File Date: 01/14/2008 Service Date: 01/11/2008 |
|
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (CN2): AARON GARZA SERVED: 01/11/2008 FILED: 01/14/2008 Served By: JERRY C. BOUCHER CN2 Issue Date: 01/09/2008 File Date: 01/14/2008 Service Date: 01/11/2008 |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC SHEET AND CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET MAILED |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.