Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dodeka, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Klein, Joel H., against Motal,Jr, Edwin F, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Saldana, Marisela presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
June 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NTC O NONSUIT WITHOUT PREJUDICE/CC |
|
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN F DEFAULT JGMT /GG |
|
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (PU): EDWIN F. MOTAL,JR. SERVED: 04/12/2008 FILED: 04/16/2008 Served By: GARY S MCCLUSKEY OTH Issue Date: 04/02/2008 File Date: 04/16/2008 Service Date: 04/12/2008 |
|
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event | CITATION (PU): EDWIN F. MOTAL,JR. SERVED: 04/12/2008 FILED: 04/16/2008 Served By: GARY S MCCLUSKEY OTH Issue Date: 04/02/2008 File Date: 04/16/2008 Service Date: 04/12/2008 | |
March 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET/JM |
|
March 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv INFO SHEET REQ SVC/JM |
|
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC SHEET AND CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET MAILED |
|
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv COVER LETTER WITH SVC INSTRUCTIONS/CP |
|
December 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PCP SERVICE SHEET/CP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.