Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dodeka, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Klein, Joel H., against Barrera, Annie M, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Longoria, Jose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN T REINSTATE/CC |
|
May 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) D.W.O.P. |
|
May 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FINAL HEARING |
|
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DEFAULT HEARING |
|
March 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FIAT |
|
October 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FRM JOEL H KLEIN |
|
August 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFDVT OF NON-MILITARY STATUS/GAG |
|
August 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFDVT OF LIQUIDATED DAMAGES IN A COLLECTION CASE/GAG |
|
August 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CERTF OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS/GAG |
|
August 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/GAG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.