Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cacv Of Colorado, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by De Loney, Christopher R., against Lanphier, George, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Longoria, Jose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2007 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
August 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DEFAULT JUDGMENT/CC |
|
January 02, 2008 | Docket Event | CITATION (R): GEORGE LANPHIER SERVED: 07/21/2008 FILED: 08/18/2008 Issue Date: 01/02/2008 File Date: 08/18/2008 Service Date: 07/21/2008 | |
January 02, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (R): GEORGE LANPHIER SERVED: 07/21/2008 FILED: 08/18/2008 Issue Date: 01/02/2008 File Date: 08/18/2008 Service Date: 07/21/2008 |
|
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CVR LTR W/INSTRUCTIONS/JJM |
|
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC SHEET REQ SVC/JJM |
|
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CVL INFO SHEET/JJM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.