Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bank Of America, Na, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Donnelly, Rachel U, against Abbassinezhad, Akbar, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Watts, Sandra L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWatts, Sandra L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2007 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FRM CODILIS & STAWIARSKI PC |
|
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) Final Hearing |
|
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) OTHER |
|
March 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFFDVT OF MAILING EFILED/EA |
|
March 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLTS SERVICEMEMBERS AFFDVT EFILED/EA |
|
March 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CASE SET FOR DCC 4-1-08 AT 1:30 PM |
|
March 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOW ADDRESS FOR AKBAR ABBASSINEZHAD EFILED |
|
March 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv BUSINESS RECORD AFFIDAVIT OF C/R FOR BANK OF AMERICA EFILED/EA |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: AKBAR ABBASSINEZHAD |
|
December 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NOTICE TO AKBAR ABBASSINEZHAD/CP E-FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.