Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
South Texas Area Resources Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Barre, Denny, against Saldana, Robert Q, Saldana, Ofelia S, represented by Rigely, George A, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Saldana, Marisela presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2007 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NTC O JGMNT |
|
November 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AND EXPENSES/ RM |
|
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DEFNTS MTN TO COMPEL DISCOVERY BY PLNT AND FOR ATTORNEY FEES |
|
September 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv 1ST AMD MTN T TRANSFER VENUE & GENERAL DENIAL /GG |
|
August 22, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv DCC: 9/3/08 @ 10:15AM |
|
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFFIDAVIT IN RELATION TO MTN TO TRANSFER VENUE/RM |
|
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN TO TRANSFER VENUE: OFELIA S. SALDANA Issue Date: 05/05/2008 |
|
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event | CITATION (R): OFELIA S. SALDANA SERVED: 04/04/2008 FILED: 04/14/2008 Issue Date: 12/11/2007 File Date: 04/14/2008 Service Date: 04/04/2008 | |
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (R): ROBERT Q. SALDANA SERVED: 04/08/2008 FILED: 04/14/2008 Issue Date: 12/11/2007 File Date: 04/14/2008 Service Date: 04/08/2008 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.