Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Puente, Michelle, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case against Schulze,Md, John Paul, represented by Woolsey, Richard C., Vela-Martinez, Melissa, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Longoria, Jose presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLongoria, Jose Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2007 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv FILE T BKKG |
|
April 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR F COA: APPEAL D.W.O.P.; MANDATE ENCLSD |
|
January 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR F COA;APPEAL WAS D.W.O.P, MEMO AND JGMT ENCLD ACG - . |
|
October 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SUPPLMNTL CLRK'S REC SENT TO COA |
|
October 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv FAX F ATTY MELISSA VELA-MARTINEZ REQUEST SUPPLMNTL CLRK'S REC |
|
October 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv BILL OF COST (NO CHARGE) SUPPLMNTL CLRK'S REC |
|
August 06, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CRT RPTR'S REC MTN TO DISMISS PUT IN FOLDER |
|
June 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR F COA: CLRK'S REC VOL 1 RECD |
|
June 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CLRK'S REC SENT TO COA |
|
June 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv BILL OF COST (PAUPER'S AFFIDAVIT FILED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.