Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case against Rodriguez, Stephen, represented by Ellison, Scott M, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 30, 2007 |
CategorySeizure And Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) AGREED JUDGMENT CV 0000 P 0000- CHANGE MADE TO FINAL ORDER |
|
March 31, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RULE 11 AGREEMENT LETTER /LS |
|
June 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: STEPHEN. RODRIGUEZ |
|
May 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION NPDC (CN1): STEPHEN. RODRIGUEZ SERVED: 06/01/2007 FILED: 06/04/2007 Served By: RUDY CACERES CN1 Issue Date: 05/31/2007 File Date: 06/04/2007 Service Date: 06/01/2007 |
|
May 31, 2007 | Docket Event | CITATION NPDC (CN1): STEPHEN. RODRIGUEZ SERVED: 06/01/2007 FILED: 06/04/2007 Served By: RUDY CACERES CN1 Issue Date: 05/31/2007 File Date: 06/04/2007 Service Date: 06/01/2007 | |
May 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET/JM |
|
May 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
May 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
May 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv INFO SHEET REQ NO SVC/JM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.