Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jfk Home Moving, Bell, D B A, William, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Sibley, David A, against Free, Anna, Free, Russell, represented by Canales, Gabriella S., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales Ramos, Nelva presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzales Ramos, Nelva Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2007 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CCR COMPLETE LESLIE MEGIN KOCH (MELISSA) F PU/SH |
|
October 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RTN NOTC O JGMT /GG |
|
October 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF CV 0000 P 0000- CHANGE MADE TO FINAL ORDER |
|
October 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv NTC O NONSUIT/CC |
|
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) Court Status Hearing |
|
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv STATUS HEARING SET ON 10/08/08 AT 1:30PM |
|
April 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER GRANTING MTN FOR W/DRWL OF COUNSEL (I) |
|
May 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: RUSSELL FREE |
|
April 03, 2007 | Docket Event | CITATION (PU): RUSSELL FREE SERVED: Issue Date: 04/03/2007 | |
April 03, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (PU): ANNA FREE SERVED: Issue Date: 04/03/2007 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.