Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case against Flores, John J, Bank Of America,Na, Garza, Garza, As Parent, Victoria, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Longoria, Jose presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLongoria, Jose Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2007 |
CategorySeizure And Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CM#7001 0360 0003 6062 6466-JOHN J. FLORES |
|
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event | CITATION (CM): VICTORIA GARZA, AS PARENT SERVED: UNSERVED FILED: 04/23/2007 Served By: CERTIFIED MAIL CM Issue Date: 04/02/2007 File Date: 04/23/2007 | |
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CM#7001 0360 0003 6062 6473-VICTORIA GARZA, AS PARENT OF |
|
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (CM): BANK OF AMERICA,N.A. SERVED: 04/06/2007 FILED: 04/10/2007 Served By: CERTIFIED MAIL CM Issue Date: 04/02/2007 File Date: 04/10/2007 Service Date: 04/06/2007 |
|
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event | CITATION (CM): JOHN J. FLORES SERVED: 04/03/2007 FILED: 04/05/2007 Served By: CERTIFIED MAIL CM Issue Date: 04/02/2007 File Date: 04/05/2007 Service Date: 04/03/2007 | |
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (CM): VICTORIA GARZA, AS PARENT SERVED: UNSERVED FILED: 04/23/2007 Served By: CERTIFIED MAIL CM Issue Date: 04/02/2007 File Date: 04/23/2007 |
|
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CM#7001 0360 0003 6062 6459-BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. |
|
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (CM): JOHN J. FLORES SERVED: 04/03/2007 FILED: 04/05/2007 Served By: CERTIFIED MAIL CM Issue Date: 04/02/2007 File Date: 04/05/2007 Service Date: 04/03/2007 |
|
April 02, 2007 | Docket Event | CITATION (CM): BANK OF AMERICA,N.A. SERVED: 04/06/2007 FILED: 04/10/2007 Served By: CERTIFIED MAIL CM Issue Date: 04/02/2007 File Date: 04/10/2007 Service Date: 04/06/2007 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.