Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
De Rodriguez, Wilfrida Del Puerto, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Harris, James R, Greenwell, Andrew M, against The Unknown And Unborn Children, Dove, Joe, Jr., Aquino, Eduardo Luis Mario, Md, represented by Chaves, Douglas E, Leshin, Richard L., Horne, Daniel F, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 08, 2004 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL I |
|
November 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FINAL JUDGMENT - NO JURY |
|
September 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER APPT ATTY MINNERVA ARRIAGA AS GRDN AD LITEM I . |
|
September 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN T APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM/JM |
|
August 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Citation CIT/PUBLICA:NPDC (NCS): THE UNKNOWN AND UNBORN CHILDREN SERVED: 09/04/2007 FILED: 09/06/2007 Served By: JIM KAELIN NCS Issue Date: 08/09/2007 File Date: 09/06/2007 Service Date: 09/04/2007 |
|
August 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIT/PUBLICA:NPDC (NCS): THE UNKNOWN AND UNBORN CHILDREN SERVED: 09/04/2007 FILED: 09/06/2007 Served By: JIM KAELIN NCS Issue Date: 08/09/2007 File Date: 09/06/2007 Service Date: 09/04/2007 |
|
August 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC SHEET REQ SVC/JJM |
|
August 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ORDER ON MTN TO REQUIRE CITATION BY PUBLICATION I . |
|
June 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv AFDVIT F CITATION B PUBLICATION /GG |
|
June 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN T REQUIRE CITATION B PUBLICATION /GG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.