Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Saldana, Marisela presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 22, 2004 |
CategoryJudgment Nisi |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RTN NOTC O JGMT/DM |
|
May 10, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DISMISSED BY PLAINTIFF |
|
April 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SERVICEMEMBER'S CIVIL RELIEF ACT AFFIDAVIT/AMD |
|
November 03, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv JDGMT NISI & COPY (CM): GARZA BAIL BONDS, SURETY $500.00 SERVED: 11/04/2004 FILED: 11/05/2004 Served By: CERTIFIED MAIL CM Issue Date: 11/03/2004 File Date: 11/05/2004 Service Date: 11/04/2004 |
|
November 03, 2004 | Docket Event |
Citation JDGMT NISI & COPY (CM): GARZA BAIL BONDS, SURETY $500.00 SERVED: 11/04/2004 FILED: 11/05/2004 Served By: CERTIFIED MAIL CM Issue Date: 11/03/2004 File Date: 11/05/2004 Service Date: 11/04/2004 |
|
October 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SVC REQ SHEET /AS |
|
October 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
October 22, 2004 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.