Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Turner, Johnnie, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Webb, Charles C., Jr., against Structall Building Systems, Inc, represented by Vara, Gilbert, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Klager, James E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKlager, James E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2004 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) OTHER |
|
June 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv JOINT MTN T DISMISS /GG |
|
September 24, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: STRUCTALL BUILDING SYSTEMS, INC. |
|
August 20, 2004 | Docket Event | CITATION NPDC (PU): STRUCTALL BUILDING SYSTEMS, INC. SERVED: 09/07/2004 FILED: 09/24/2004 Served By: TEXAS CIVIL PROCESS INC CP21 Issue Date: 08/20/2004 File Date: 09/24/2004 Service Date: 09/07/2004 | |
August 20, 2004 | Docket Event | Case Filed (OCA OPEN) | |
August 20, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION NPDC (PU): STRUCTALL BUILDING SYSTEMS, INC. SERVED: 09/07/2004 FILED: 09/24/2004 Served By: TEXAS CIVIL PROCESS INC CP21 Issue Date: 08/20/2004 File Date: 09/24/2004 Service Date: 09/07/2004 |
|
August 20, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv INFO SHEET REQ NO SVC/JM |
|
August 20, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
|
August 20, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv JURY FEE: Pd. by CHARLES C. WEBB, JR. Issue Date: 08/20/2004 |
|
August 20, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET/JM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.