Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lara, Pedro, Jr., Saenz, Zelda, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bonilla, Ruben, Jr., against Castaneda, Zulema, Alvarado, Michael, represented by English, Monte J., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Klager, James E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKlager, James E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2004 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) OTHER |
|
November 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (IMAGE) |
|
November 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) NOTICE REGARDING ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (IMAGE) |
|
November 18, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RULE 11 AGRMNT/GG |
|
October 06, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RULE 11 AGRMNT/GG |
|
September 14, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: MICHAEL ALVARADO |
|
September 10, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv JURY FEE: Pd. by MONTE J. ENGLISH Issue Date: 09/10/2004 |
|
August 30, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: ZULEMA CASTANEDA |
|
August 19, 2004 | Docket Event | CITATION NPDC (PU): MICHAEL ALVARADO SERVED: 08/24/2004 FILED: 08/26/2004 Served By: PEREZ, JOE R. CP43 Issue Date: 08/19/2004 File Date: 08/26/2004 Service Date: 08/24/2004 | |
August 19, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION NPDC (PU): MICHAEL ALVARADO SERVED: 08/24/2004 FILED: 08/26/2004 Served By: PEREZ, JOE R. CP43 Issue Date: 08/19/2004 File Date: 08/26/2004 Service Date: 08/24/2004 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.