Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Trevino, Jason R, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hirsch, Jay D., against Ramirez, Frances A, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Saldana, Marisela presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSaldana, Marisela Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2004 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv RTN NOTC O JGMT/GG |
|
February 22, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) OTHER |
|
January 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLT NOTC O NONSUIT/GG |
|
August 25, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION (CM): FRANCES A. RAMIREZ SERVED: UNSERVED FILED: 09/07/2004 Served By: CERTIFIED MAIL CM Issue Date: 08/25/2004 File Date: 09/07/2004 |
|
August 25, 2004 | Docket Event | CITATION (CM): FRANCES A. RAMIREZ SERVED: UNSERVED FILED: 09/07/2004 Served By: CERTIFIED MAIL CM Issue Date: 08/25/2004 File Date: 09/07/2004 | |
August 19, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL CASE INFO SHEET/JAU |
|
August 18, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv JURY FEE: Pd. by JAY D. HIRSCH Issue Date: 08/18/2004 |
|
August 18, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv SERVICE SHEET REQUESTING SERVICE/JAU |
|
August 18, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv LTR FR ATTORNEY WITH SERVICE INSTRUCTIONS/JAU |
|
August 18, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.