Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Citibank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Adkins, Allen L., against Benesh, Traci L, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Vargas, Robert J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVargas, Robert J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2004 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) D.W.O.P. |
|
November 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NON-SUIT (WITHOUT PREJUDICE)/TG |
|
December 13, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv FAX RE: ORG ANS(9-15-2004) & RESPONSE TO DEFAULT JUDGEMENT/JM |
|
December 02, 2004 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT (I) |
|
September 27, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv MTN F DEFAULT JGMT/GG |
|
September 15, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL ANSWER: TRACI L. BENESH |
|
August 18, 2004 | Docket Event | CITATION NPDC (PU): TRACI L. BENESH SERVED: 08/20/2004 FILED: 08/20/2004 Served By: PROFESSIONAL CIVIL PROCESS CP17 Issue Date: 08/18/2004 File Date: 08/20/2004 Service Date: 08/20/2004 | |
August 18, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CITATION NPDC (PU): TRACI L. BENESH SERVED: 08/20/2004 FILED: 08/20/2004 Served By: PROFESSIONAL CIVIL PROCESS CP17 Issue Date: 08/18/2004 File Date: 08/20/2004 Service Date: 08/20/2004 |
|
August 16, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv CIVIL INFORM SHEET/DM |
|
August 16, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Event Conv ORIGINAL PETITION FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.